NJ A1130 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2385
Note: Carry Foward to future S301
Note: Carry Over of previous A1868
Note: Carry Foward to future S301
Note: Carry Over of previous A1868
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires notice of certain transportation-related infrastructure projects and activities to be published on Internet website, and directs State Comptroller to monitor publication of those notifications. *
Title
Requires notice of certain transportation-related infrastructure projects and activities to be published on Internet website, and directs State Comptroller to monitor publication of those notifications. *
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
2019-01-31 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0) |
2018-12-17 | Assembly | Assembly Substitution (Johnson) |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1130 (Carry Over) 2019-03-18 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A1130 (Carry Over) 2019-03-18 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A1868 (Carry Over) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
S355 (Same As) 2019-03-18 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A1130 (Carry Over) 2019-03-18 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A1868 (Carry Over) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
S355 (Same As) 2019-03-18 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee