NJ A1133 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A471
Note: Carry Over of previous S1487
Note: Carry Over of previous S1487
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
Pending: Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
Pending: Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for uniform regulation of small wireless facility deployment in this State.
Title
Provides for uniform regulation of small wireless facility deployment in this State.
Sponsors
Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Rep. Louis Greenwald [D] | Rep. Wayne DeAngelo [D] | Rep. Clinton Calabrese [D] |
Rep. Robert Karabinchak [D] | Rep. Shama Haider [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A471 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
S1487 (Carry Over) 2022-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
S2324 (Same As) 2024-01-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
S1487 (Carry Over) 2022-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
S2324 (Same As) 2024-01-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/A1133 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/A1500/1133_I1.HTM |