NJ A1141 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2403
Note: Carry Over of previous A2211
Note: Carry Over of previous A2211
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-18 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-18 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates program for installing standby emergency power generators in new senior housing.
Title
Creates program for installing standby emergency power generators in new senior housing.
Sponsors
Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] | Rep. Verlina Reynolds-Jackson [D] | Rep. Thomas Giblin [D] | Rep. Joann Downey [D] |
Rep. R. Bruce Land [D] | Rep. Shanique Speight [D] | Rep. Cleopatra Tucker [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-10-18 - Assembly - Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1141 (Carry Over) 2018-10-18 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A2211 (Carry Over) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee
S1152 (Same As) 2018-01-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A2211 (Carry Over) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee
S1152 (Same As) 2018-01-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee