NJ A1141 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1326
Note: Carry Foward to future S952
Note: Carry Over of previous A376
Note: Carry Over of previous S1240
Note: Carry Foward to future S952
Note: Carry Over of previous A376
Note: Carry Over of previous S1240
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Pending: Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Pending: Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires health insurance coverage for annual mental health screening.
Title
Requires health insurance coverage for annual mental health screening.
Sponsors
Rep. Christopher DePhillips [R] | Rep. Nancy Munoz [R] | Sen. John McKeon [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] |
Rep. Aura Dunn [R] | Rep. Annette Chaparro [D] | Rep. Gregory McGuckin [R] | Rep. John Catalano [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1141 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
A1141 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
A376 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
S1240 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S2790 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A1141 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
A376 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
S1240 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S2790 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/A1141 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/A1500/1141_I1.HTM |