NJ A1169 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-20 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-20 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Removes licensing requirement for recreational bingo games.
Title
Removes licensing requirement for recreational bingo games.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee | |
2010-05-20 | Passed by the Assembly (78-0-0) | |
2010-05-06 | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2010-01-25 | Transferred to Assembly Regulatory Oversight and Gaming Committee | |
2010-01-12 | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism and the Arts Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1172 (Same As) 2010-02-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee