NJ A1201 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4536
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-08 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-08 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes Service Dog Pilot Program for inmates in Camden County; appropriates $150,000.
Title
Establishes Service Dog Pilot Program for inmates in Camden County; appropriates $150,000.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-08 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-08 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4536 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Substituted by S2471 (1R)
S1593 (Same As) 2018-02-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S1593 (Same As) 2018-02-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee