NJ A1263 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A546
Note: Carry Over of previous A3341
Note: Carry Over of previous S334
Note: Carry Over of previous A3341
Note: Carry Over of previous S334
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-16 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-16 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires municipalities, public utilities, and State to use LED technology in certain street lights.
Title
Requires municipalities, public utilities, and State to use LED technology in certain street lights.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
2022-01-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1263 (Carry Over) 2022-05-16 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A3341 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
S334 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A3341 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
S334 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee