NJ A1272 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4873
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-22 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-22 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
"Student Online Personal Protection Act." *
Title
"Student Online Personal Protection Act." *
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0) |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4873 (Carry Over) 2015-12-10 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S794 (Same As) 2016-01-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
S794 (Same As) 2016-01-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee