NJ A1275 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1696
Note: Carry Foward to future S2000
Note: Carry Foward to future S2000
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-09-15 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-09-15 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes prescribed burning in certain circumstances.
Title
Authorizes prescribed burning in certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Rep. Ronald Dancer [R] | Rep. Herbert Conaway [D] | Rep. Marlene Caride [D] | Rep. Celeste Riley [D] |
Rep. Upendra Chivukula [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-09-15 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-15 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2014-09-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (78-0-0) |
2014-06-23 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-02-24 | Assembly | Reported as an Assembly Committee Substitute and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2014-01-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1275 (Carry Over) 2014-09-15 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A1275 (Carry Over) 2014-09-15 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S2112 (Same As) 2014-09-15 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A1275 (Carry Over) 2014-09-15 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S2112 (Same As) 2014-09-15 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee