NJ A1348 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A3074
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-23 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Pending: Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-23 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Pending: Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires boil water notices to be provided by certain public water systems via telephone, email or text message.
Title
Requires boil water notices to be provided by certain public water systems via telephone, email or text message.
Sponsors
Rep. Linda Stender [D] | Sen. John McKeon [D] | Rep. Annette Quijano [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] |
Rep. Nancy Pinkin [D] | Rep. Angelica Jimenez [D] | Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-23 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
2014-06-23 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (74-1-2) |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Gusciora) |
2014-03-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1348 (Carry Over) 2014-06-23 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S1121 (Same As) 2014-01-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S1121 (Same As) 2014-01-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee