NJ A1369 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5853
Note: Carry Over of previous S4332
Note: Carry Over of previous S4332
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates portion of State Highway Route 27 in Princeton as "Patrolman Billie D. Ellis Memorial Highway."
Title
Designates portion of State Highway Route 27 in Princeton as "Patrolman Billie D. Ellis Memorial Highway."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (79-0-0) |
2020-02-03 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5853 (Carry Over) 2019-12-09 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S4332 (Carry Over) 2019-12-12 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S4332 (Carry Over) 2019-12-12 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading