NJ A1379 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5222
Note: Carry Over of previous S3517
Note: Carry Over of previous S3517
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits all locally elected officials from receiving retroactive salary increases as of December 1, 2018.
Title
Prohibits all locally elected officials from receiving retroactive salary increases as of December 1, 2018.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5222 (Carry Over) 2019-03-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S3517 (Carry Over) 2019-03-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S3517 (Carry Over) 2019-03-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A1379 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A1500/1379_I1.HTM |