NJ A1385 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S1833
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-21 - Substituted by S970 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-21 - Substituted by S970 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires members of governing boards of public institutions of higher education to complete training program developed by institution in consultation with Secretary of Higher Education.
Title
Requires members of governing boards of public institutions of higher education to complete training program developed by institution in consultation with Secretary of Higher Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Substituted by S970 (2R) |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1833 (Carry Over) 2019-06-06 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
S970 (Same As) 2021-10-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.250.
S970 (Same As) 2021-10-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.250.