NJ A139 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S652
Note: Carry Foward to future A117
Note: Carry Over of previous A3464
Note: Carry Over of previous S1704
Note: Carry Foward to future A117
Note: Carry Over of previous A3464
Note: Carry Over of previous S1704
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits governing body of municipalities having population of 30,000 or less to serve as local board of health; validates certain actions.
Title
Permits governing body of municipalities having population of 30,000 or less to serve as local board of health; validates certain actions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A139 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A139 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A3464 (Carry Over) 2018-03-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S1416 (Same As) 2021-06-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S1704 (Carry Over) 2018-02-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A139 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A3464 (Carry Over) 2018-03-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S1416 (Same As) 2021-06-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S1704 (Carry Over) 2018-02-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A139 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A0500/139_I1.HTM |