NJ A1394 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A3873
Note: Carry Over of previous S2261
Note: Carry Over of previous S2261
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "Registered Apprenticeship Program for State Agencies"; makes an appropriation.
Title
Establishes "Registered Apprenticeship Program for State Agencies"; makes an appropriation.
Sponsors
Rep. Yvonne Lopez [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] |
Sen. Andrew Zwicker [D] | Rep. Verlina Reynolds-Jackson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3873 (Carry Over) 2018-05-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
S3562 (Same As) 2021-05-06 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S2261 (Carry Over) 2018-03-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
S3562 (Same As) 2021-05-06 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S2261 (Carry Over) 2018-03-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A1394 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A1500/1394_I1.HTM |