NJ A1413 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1755
Note: Carry Over of previous A3380
Note: Carry Over of previous A3380
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 29 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-12-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on October 29 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-12-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Silver Alert System receive same broadcast alerts as Amber Alert System.
Title
Requires Silver Alert System receive same broadcast alerts as Amber Alert System.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
2018-10-29 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0) |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1413 (Carry Over) 2018-12-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A3380 (Carry Over) 2016-03-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S444 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A3380 (Carry Over) 2016-03-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S444 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee