NJ A1432 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A3376
Note: Carry Over of previous A914
Note: Carry Over of previous S1098
Note: Carry Over of previous A914
Note: Carry Over of previous S1098
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
Pending: Assembly Women and Children Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
Pending: Assembly Women and Children Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires psychological examination when parent loses custody of child and wants to regain custody of child who is in care or custody of grandparent.
Title
Requires psychological examination when parent loses custody of child and wants to regain custody of child who is in care or custody of grandparent.
Sponsors
Rep. BettyLou DeCroce [R] | Rep. Nicholas Chiaravalloti [D] | Rep. Christopher DePhillips [R] | Rep. Thomas Giblin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1432 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
A914 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
S1773 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S1098 (Carry Over) 2018-01-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A914 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
S1773 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S1098 (Carry Over) 2018-01-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A1432 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A1500/1432_I1.HTM |