NJ A1443 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A2197
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-30 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-30 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires coverage of medication therapy management in Medicaid and NJ FamilyCare.
Title
Requires coverage of medication therapy management in Medicaid and NJ FamilyCare.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-30 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-30 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2197 (Carry Over) 2014-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
S1175 (Same As) 2016-02-29 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S1175 (Same As) 2016-02-29 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee