NJ A1445 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2095
Note: Carry Foward to future S325
Note: Carry Over of previous A6242
Note: Carry Over of previous S3444
Note: Carry Foward to future S325
Note: Carry Over of previous A6242
Note: Carry Over of previous S3444
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Pending: Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Pending: Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires NJT rail stations and bus and rail terminals to display historical information about area in or around stations and terminals.
Title
Requires NJT rail stations and bus and rail terminals to display historical information about area in or around stations and terminals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1445 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
A1445 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
A6242 (Carry Over) 2021-12-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
S3444 (Carry Over) 2021-02-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
S149 (Same As) 2022-11-21 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
A1445 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
A6242 (Carry Over) 2021-12-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
S3444 (Carry Over) 2021-02-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
S149 (Same As) 2022-11-21 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/A1445 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/A1500/1445_I1.HTM |