NJ A1471 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2245
Note: Carry Foward to future S3381
Note: Carry Over of previous A5733
Note: Carry Over of previous S3808
Note: Carry Foward to future S3381
Note: Carry Over of previous A5733
Note: Carry Over of previous S3808
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-23 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-23 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DHS to establish quality-based reimbursement system for registered family child care providers participating in Grow NJ Kids.
Title
Requires DHS to establish quality-based reimbursement system for registered family child care providers participating in Grow NJ Kids.
Sponsors
Rep. Yvonne Lopez [D] | Rep. Gabriela Mosquera [D] | Rep. Eliana Marin [D] | Sen. Britnee Timberlake [D] |
Rep. Shama Haider [D] | Rep. Clinton Calabrese [D] | Rep. Shanique Speight [D] | Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-23 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2023-01-23 | Assembly | Reported as an Assembly Committee Substitute and Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
2022-01-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1471 (Carry Over) 2023-03-23 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A1471 (Carry Over) 2023-03-23 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A5733 (Carry Over) 2021-05-17 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
S3808 (Carry Over) 2021-05-20 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S1100 (Same As) 2022-01-31 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S2465 (Same As) 2022-10-31 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A1471 (Carry Over) 2023-03-23 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A5733 (Carry Over) 2021-05-17 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
S3808 (Carry Over) 2021-05-20 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S1100 (Same As) 2022-01-31 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S2465 (Same As) 2022-10-31 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee