NJ A1481 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4821
Note: Carry Over of previous A4823
Note: Carry Over of previous S3283
Note: Carry Over of previous A4823
Note: Carry Over of previous S3283
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on January 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Withdrawn Because Approved P.L.2023, c.318.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on January 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Withdrawn Because Approved P.L.2023, c.318.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs DEP to take certain actions concerning identification and testing of microplastics in drinking water, and requires DEP and BPU to study and promote use of microplastics removal technologies.
Title
Directs DEP to take certain actions concerning identification and testing of microplastics in drinking water, and requires DEP and BPU to study and promote use of microplastics removal technologies.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Karabinchak [D] | Rep. Herbert Conaway [D] | Rep. Gary Schaer [D] | Rep. Linda Carter [D] |
Rep. Shanique Speight [D] | Rep. Christopher Tully [D] | Rep. Lisa Swain [D] | Rep. Yvonne Lopez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-09 | Assembly | Withdrawn Because Approved P.L.2023, c.318. |
2024-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment, Natural Resources, and Solid Waste Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4821 (Carry Over) 2024-01-08 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (35-0)
A4823 (Carry Over) 2023-03-23 - Combined with A4821 (ACS)
S3283 (Carry Over) 2023-12-21 - Substituted by A4821/4823 (ACS/1R)
A4823 (Carry Over) 2023-03-23 - Combined with A4821 (ACS)
S3283 (Carry Over) 2023-12-21 - Substituted by A4821/4823 (ACS/1R)
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/A1481 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/A1500/1481_I1.HTM |