NJ A1512 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2415
Note: Carry Foward to future S2802
Note: Carry Over of previous A1755
Note: Carry Foward to future S2802
Note: Carry Over of previous A1755
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-15 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-15 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Silver Alert System receive same broadcast alerts as Amber Alert System.
Title
Requires Silver Alert System receive same broadcast alerts as Amber Alert System.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-01-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1512 (Carry Over) 2023-06-15 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A1512 (Carry Over) 2023-06-15 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A1755 (Carry Over) 2021-06-02 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S1821 (Same As) 2022-02-28 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A1512 (Carry Over) 2023-06-15 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A1755 (Carry Over) 2021-06-02 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S1821 (Same As) 2022-02-28 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee