NJ A1514 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A3572
Note: Carry Over of previous A4406
Note: Carry Over of previous S2795
Note: Carry Over of previous A4406
Note: Carry Over of previous S2795
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-02 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Health Committee
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-02 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Health Committee
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires each nursing home to employ patient advocate.
Title
Requires each nursing home to employ patient advocate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Aging and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-02 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Health Committee |
2022-01-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Aging and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1514 (Carry Over) 2022-06-02 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Health Committee
A4406 (Carry Over) 2020-07-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Aging and Senior Services Committee
S2795 (Carry Over) 2020-08-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S1040 (Same As) 2022-01-31 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A4406 (Carry Over) 2020-07-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Aging and Senior Services Committee
S2795 (Carry Over) 2020-08-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S1040 (Same As) 2022-01-31 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee