NJ A1580 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 3 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-12-17 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 3 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-12-17 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The "Family and Private Burial Grounds Preservation Act."
Title
The "Family and Private Burial Grounds Preservation Act."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-03 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 26 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2012-12-03 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (46-26-4) |
2012-11-19 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2012-01-10 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S806 (Same As) 2012-05-14 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee