NJ A1640 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-21 - Substituted by S1219 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-21 - Substituted by S1219 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases compensation for persons wrongfully imprisoned.
Title
Increases compensation for persons wrongfully imprisoned.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-21 | Assembly | Substituted by S1219 (1R) |
2013-02-07 | Assembly | Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2013-02-07 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2012-01-10 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1219 (Same As) 2013-12-27 - Approved P.L.2013, c.171.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2012/A1640 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/A2000/1640_I1.HTM |