NJ A165 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1778
Note: Carry Foward to future S2256
Note: Carry Over of previous A192
Note: Carry Over of previous S785
Note: Carry Foward to future S2256
Note: Carry Over of previous A192
Note: Carry Over of previous S785
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-25 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Wimberly)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-25 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Wimberly)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "New Jersey STEM Scholars Grant Pilot Program" in Department of Education.
Title
Establishes "New Jersey STEM Scholars Grant Pilot Program" in Department of Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-25 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Wimberly) |
2023-05-11 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-01-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A165 (Carry Over) 2023-05-25 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Wimberly)
A165 (Carry Over) 2023-05-25 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Wimberly)
A192 (Carry Over) 2021-06-28 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
S785 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
S468 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A165 (Carry Over) 2023-05-25 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Wimberly)
A192 (Carry Over) 2021-06-28 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
S785 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
S468 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee