NJ A1660 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-10-15 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-10-15 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases contribution limit by counties and municipalities to volunteer first aid, ambulance, and rescue squads.
Title
Increases contribution limit by counties and municipalities to volunteer first aid, ambulance, and rescue squads.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-15 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-10-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-05-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
2012-03-15 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (79-0-0) |
2012-02-16 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2012-01-30 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-01-10 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S960 (Same As) 2012-10-15 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading