NJ A1662 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4341
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Approved P.L.2017, c.155.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Approved P.L.2017, c.155.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires development and maintenance of data dashboard report to advise of open bed availability in residential facilities providing behavioral health services.
Title
Requires development and maintenance of data dashboard report to advise of open bed availability in residential facilities providing behavioral health services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2466 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-21 | Senate | Approved P.L.2017, c.155. |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0) |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Substituted for S2466 |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2016-06-27 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (78-0-1) |
2016-06-23 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-06-23 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Budget Committee |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4341 (Carry Over) 2015-12-14 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S2466 (Same As) 2017-06-19 - Substituted by A1662 (1R)
S2466 (Same As) 2017-06-19 - Substituted by A1662 (1R)