NJ A1672 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5463
Note: Carry Over of previous S3819
Note: Carry Over of previous S3819
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-28 - Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-28 - Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes disabled persons receiving disability payments pursuant to federal Railroad Retirement Act eligible to receive homestead property tax reimbursement.
Title
Makes disabled persons receiving disability payments pursuant to federal Railroad Retirement Act eligible to receive homestead property tax reimbursement.
Sponsors
Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] | Rep. Robert Karabinchak [D] | Rep. Dan Hutchison [D] | Rep. Dawn Fantasia [R] |
Rep. Cody Miller [D] | Rep. Michael Inganamort [R] | Rep. Rosy Bagolie [D] | Rep. Shanique Speight [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-06-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-13 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-13 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-28 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0) |
2024-06-24 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2024-05-13 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2024-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5463 (Carry Over) 2023-05-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
S3819 (Carry Over) 2023-05-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
S1285 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
S3819 (Carry Over) 2023-05-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
S1285 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee