NJ A1682 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5014
Note: Carry Over of previous S3670
Note: Carry Over of previous S3670
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires school districts to provide instruction on labor movement as part of New Jersey Student Learning Standards in Social Studies.
Title
Requires school districts to provide instruction on labor movement as part of New Jersey Student Learning Standards in Social Studies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5014 (Carry Over) 2023-01-10 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S3670 (Carry Over) 2023-02-28 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
S1054 (Same As) 2024-06-20 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S3670 (Carry Over) 2023-02-28 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
S1054 (Same As) 2024-06-20 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/A1682 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/A2000/1682_I1.HTM |