NJ A1701 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2451
Note: Carry Foward to future S991
Note: Carry Over of previous A5582
Note: Carry Over of previous S3659
Note: Carry Foward to future S991
Note: Carry Over of previous A5582
Note: Carry Over of previous S3659
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-11-27 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-11-27 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes permanent unit in Office of Emergency Management to address access and functional needs of residents related to disasters and emergencies.
Title
Establishes permanent unit in Office of Emergency Management to address access and functional needs of residents related to disasters and emergencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2023-06-30 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0) |
2023-06-22 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2023-06-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2022-01-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1701 (Carry Over) 2023-11-27 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A1701 (Carry Over) 2023-11-27 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A5582 (Carry Over) 2021-05-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S3659 (Carry Over) 2021-12-16 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S285 (Same As) 2022-10-13 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A1701 (Carry Over) 2023-11-27 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A5582 (Carry Over) 2021-05-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S3659 (Carry Over) 2021-12-16 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S285 (Same As) 2022-10-13 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee