NJ A171 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1784
Note: Carry Over of previous A3784
Note: Carry Over of previous S3343
Note: Carry Over of previous A3784
Note: Carry Over of previous S3343
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enhances protections against fraudulent deed recordings.
Title
Enhances protections against fraudulent deed recordings.
Sponsors
Rep. Linda Carter [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] | Rep. Shavonda Sumter [D] | Rep. Verlina Reynolds-Jackson [D] |
Rep. Robert Karabinchak [D] | Sen. Britnee Timberlake [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A171 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
A3784 (Carry Over) 2021-06-01 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
S3343 (Carry Over) 2021-02-09 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S390 (Same As) 2022-03-07 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A3784 (Carry Over) 2021-06-01 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
S3343 (Carry Over) 2021-02-09 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S390 (Same As) 2022-03-07 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/A171 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/A0500/171_I1.HTM |