NJ A1711 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A2287
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-25 - Substituted by S875 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-25 - Substituted by S875 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the "Sexual Assault Victim's Bill of Rights."
Title
Establishes the "Sexual Assault Victim's Bill of Rights."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Substituted by S875 (1R) |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2287 (Carry Over) 2016-02-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
S875 (Same As) 2019-05-10 - Approved P.L.2019, c.103.
S875 (Same As) 2019-05-10 - Approved P.L.2019, c.103.