NJ A1713 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1948
Note: Carry Foward to future S2223
Note: Carry Over of previous A3792
Note: Carry Over of previous S4026
Note: Carry Foward to future S2223
Note: Carry Over of previous A3792
Note: Carry Over of previous S4026
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-30 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-30 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires VCCO to issue annual report to Governor and Legislature.
Title
Requires VCCO to issue annual report to Governor and Legislature.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-30 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (79-0-0) |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-01-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1713 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A1713 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A3792 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S4026 (Carry Over) 2021-11-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S2262 (Same As) 2023-01-30 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A1713 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A3792 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S4026 (Carry Over) 2021-11-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S2262 (Same As) 2023-01-30 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading