NJ A1746 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1646
Note: Carry Foward to future S1471
Note: Carry Over of previous A4202
Note: Carry Foward to future S1471
Note: Carry Over of previous A4202
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "Security Deposit Assistance Pilot Program" in Passaic, Union, Essex, Hudson, and Gloucester counties, appropriates $210,000.*
Title
Establishes "Security Deposit Assistance Pilot Program" in Passaic, Union, Essex, Hudson, and Gloucester counties, appropriates $210,000.*
Sponsors
Rep. Annette Quijano [D] | Rep. Annette Chaparro [D] | Rep. Jamel Holley [D] | Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] |
Sen. Raj Mukherji [D] | Rep. Gerald Green [D] | Rep. Pedro Mejia [D] | Rep. Shanique Speight [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-07 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1746 (Carry Over) 2019-02-07 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A1746 (Carry Over) 2019-02-07 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A4202 (Carry Over) 2017-02-27 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S3600 (Same As) 2020-01-09 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A1746 (Carry Over) 2019-02-07 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A4202 (Carry Over) 2017-02-27 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S3600 (Same As) 2020-01-09 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading