NJ A1757 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A3620
Note: Carry Over of previous A4881
Note: Carry Over of previous A4881
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-11 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-11 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires inclusion of information about discriminatory housing practices in Truth in Renting Guide.
Title
Requires inclusion of information about discriminatory housing practices in Truth in Renting Guide.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-11 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1757 (Carry Over) 2018-06-11 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A4881 (Carry Over) 2017-06-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
S2479 (Same As) 2018-04-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A4881 (Carry Over) 2017-06-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
S2479 (Same As) 2018-04-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee