NJ A1786 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2185
Note: Carry Over of previous A4467
Note: Carry Over of previous S523
Note: Carry Over of previous A4467
Note: Carry Over of previous S523
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that biennial renewal of license or certificate issued by New Jersey Board of Nursing is due on professional's birthday.
Title
Provides that biennial renewal of license or certificate issued by New Jersey Board of Nursing is due on professional's birthday.
Sponsors
Rep. Nancy Munoz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1786 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
A4467 (Carry Over) 2018-09-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
S928 (Same As) 2020-01-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S523 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A4467 (Carry Over) 2018-09-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
S928 (Same As) 2020-01-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S523 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A1786 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A2000/1786_I1.HTM |