NJ A1791 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A3268
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Approved P.L.2023, c.47.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Approved P.L.2023, c.47.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "Career and Technical Education Scholar Awards" to annually recognize outstanding career and technical education students.
Title
Establishes "Career and Technical Education Scholar Awards" to annually recognize outstanding career and technical education students.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3306 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-12 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-22 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3306 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-12 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-22 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-08 | Senate | Approved P.L.2023, c.47. |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0) |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Substituted for S3306 |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-10-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
2022-10-03 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-0-0) |
2022-09-22 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-01-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3268 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S3306 (Same As) 2023-02-27 - Substituted by A1791
S3306 (Same As) 2023-02-27 - Substituted by A1791