NJ A1813 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A1993
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-09-30 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on September 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-09-30 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits delivery of electronic smoking devices and tobacco products to individuals under 21 years of age.
Title
Prohibits delivery of electronic smoking devices and tobacco products to individuals under 21 years of age.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-09-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2024-09-26 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (73-2-0) |
2024-03-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2024-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1993 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
S3372 (Same As) 2024-06-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S3372 (Same As) 2024-06-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee