NJ A1848 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 18 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-10-25 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on October 18 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-10-25 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Imposes limits on fees charged for discovery in municipal court matters.
Title
Imposes limits on fees charged for discovery in municipal court matters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-10-18 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-10-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2012-10-18 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (79-0-0) |
2012-09-24 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-05-14 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2012-01-10 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |