NJ A1854 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4115
Note: Carry Over of previous S2413
Note: Carry Over of previous S2413
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires minimum annual State appropriation of $10 million for Public Health Priority Funding.
Title
Requires minimum annual State appropriation of $10 million for Public Health Priority Funding.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4115 (Carry Over) 2022-06-02 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
S2413 (Carry Over) 2023-05-11 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S2010 (Same As) 2024-06-06 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S2413 (Carry Over) 2023-05-11 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S2010 (Same As) 2024-06-06 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/A1854 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/A2000/1854_I1.HTM |