NJ A1871 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reverses certain changes to laws governing State treatment of unclaimed property.
Title
Reverses certain changes to laws governing State treatment of unclaimed property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-15 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 27 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2012-03-15 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (48-27-4) |
2012-03-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2012-01-10 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1962 (Same As) 2012-05-17 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee