NJ A1898 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-3)
Status: Passed on January 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-17 - Approved P.L.2013, c.238.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-3)
Status: Passed on January 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-17 - Approved P.L.2013, c.238.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends burial of indigent veterans to those who did not serve in time of war; clarifies role of DMVA in identifying deceased veterans; provides additional funding, subject to availability, for burial of indigent veterans.*
Title
Extends burial of indigent veterans to those who did not serve in time of war; clarifies role of DMVA in identifying deceased veterans; provides additional funding, subject to availability, for burial of indigent veterans.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-09 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S1075 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-09 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S1075 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-17 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2013, c.238. |
2014-01-13 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (80-0-0) |
2014-01-09 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Substituted for S1075 (2R) |
2013-12-12 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0) |
2013-02-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2012-11-19 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2012-01-10 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1075 (Same As) 2014-01-09 - Substituted by A1898 (2R)