NJ A1934 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A810
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-31 - Approved P.L.2016, c.39.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-31 - Approved P.L.2016, c.39.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts veterans' organizations from nonprofit corporation annual report filing fee.
Title
Exempts veterans' organizations from nonprofit corporation annual report filing fee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S1307 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-06 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-06 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-31 | Senate | Approved P.L.2016, c.39. |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0) |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Substituted for S1307 |
2016-06-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2016-02-18 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0) |
2016-02-08 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A810 (Carry Over) 2014-06-19 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S1307 (Same As) 2016-06-30 - Substituted by A1934
S1307 (Same As) 2016-06-30 - Substituted by A1934