NJ A1942 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2321
Note: Carry Foward to future S1483
Note: Carry Over of previous A2110
Note: Carry Foward to future S1483
Note: Carry Over of previous A2110
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-11 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-11 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Division of Highway Traffic Safety to conduct public awareness campaign regarding bicycle and pedestrian safety.
Title
Requires Division of Highway Traffic Safety to conduct public awareness campaign regarding bicycle and pedestrian safety.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-11 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-01-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1942 (Carry Over) 2023-05-11 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A1942 (Carry Over) 2023-05-11 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A2110 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
S4058 (Same As) 2023-11-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
A1942 (Carry Over) 2023-05-11 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A2110 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
S4058 (Same As) 2023-11-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee