NJ A1947 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A3332
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-22 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Conaway)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-22 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Conaway)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires county elections board give notice by Internet posting or mail when polling place location changes unexpectedly before election; requires board develop plan for polling place change notification.**
Title
Requires county elections board give notice by Internet posting or mail when polling place location changes unexpectedly before election; requires board develop plan for polling place change notification.**
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-22 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Conaway) |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-02-24 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2014-01-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1947 (Carry Over) 2014-05-22 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Conaway)