NJ A1968 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on January 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-14 - Approved P.L.2013, c.2.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on January 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-14 - Approved P.L.2013, c.2.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits surety companies to issue blanket bonds for certain local government officers and employees; applies rating criteria and underwriting standards to blanket bond coverage.*
Title
Permits surety companies to issue blanket bonds for certain local government officers and employees; applies rating criteria and underwriting standards to blanket bond coverage.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-11-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2294 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2294 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-14 | Senate | Approved P.L.2013, c.2. |
2012-11-29 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0) |
2012-11-29 | Senate | Substituted for S2294 |
2012-10-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-05-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
2012-03-15 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (78-1-0) |
2012-02-16 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (McKeon) |
2012-01-30 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-01-10 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2294 (Same As) 2012-11-29 - Substituted by A1968 (1R)