NJ A1987 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2489
Note: Carry Foward to future S1395
Note: Carry Over of previous A6237
Note: Carry Over of previous S4124
Note: Carry Foward to future S1395
Note: Carry Over of previous A6237
Note: Carry Over of previous S4124
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns development of accessory dwelling units.
Title
Concerns development of accessory dwelling units.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1987 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
A1987 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
A6237 (Carry Over) 2021-12-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
S4124 (Carry Over) 2021-11-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S345 (Same As) 2023-02-27 - Senate Amendment (Voice) (Ruiz)
A1987 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
A6237 (Carry Over) 2021-12-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
S4124 (Carry Over) 2021-11-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S345 (Same As) 2023-02-27 - Senate Amendment (Voice) (Ruiz)
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/A1987 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/A2000/1987_I1.HTM |