NJ A2029 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-11-19 - Approved P.L.2012, c.66.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-11-19 - Approved P.L.2012, c.66.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the "Honor and Remember Flag" as an official State flag.
Title
Designates the "Honor and Remember Flag" as an official State flag.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-10-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-10-04 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2007 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-10-04 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2007 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-19 | Senate | Approved P.L.2012, c.66. |
2012-10-04 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0) |
2012-10-04 | Senate | Substituted for S2007 |
2012-08-20 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-07-26 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2012-05-31 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
2012-05-24 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0) |
2012-05-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-01-10 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2007 (Same As) 2012-10-04 - Substituted by A2029