NJ A2029 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5834
Note: Carry Over of previous S4232
Note: Carry Over of previous S4232
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-13 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-13 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs DOE and DOH to develop guidelines for school districts and institutions of higher education concerning student vaping awareness campaigns.
Title
Directs DOE and DOH to develop guidelines for school districts and institutions of higher education concerning student vaping awareness campaigns.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-13 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2024-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5834 (Carry Over) 2023-12-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
S4232 (Carry Over) 2023-12-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S2987 (Same As) 2024-03-18 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S4232 (Carry Over) 2023-12-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S2987 (Same As) 2024-03-18 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee